THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION

Charity number: 219279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Owen Trustee 17 May 2020 None on record
Lynda Atkins Trustee 19 May 2019
WALLINGFORD DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Heather Spence Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
MAJOR GENERAL DAVID JOLLIFFE CB FRCP Trustee 02 May 2013 None on record
Rod Bedford Trustee 20 May 2017 None on record
DEBBIE SORKIN MA MBA Trustee 14 June 2018 None on record
Philip Moore Trustee 17 March 2014 None on record
Lt Col Joe Falzon OSJ BEM Trustee 19 May 2014 None on record
Jason Coward Trustee 19 May 2014
THE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM COMPANY LIMITED Received: On time
Tony Goodwin Trustee 17 May 2020 None on record
PAUL HARRIS Trustee 13 February 2018
CHARITY OF WILLIAM READ Received: On time
David Whimpenny Trustee 20 May 2014
THE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM COMPANY LIMITED Received: On time
GOD-UNLIMITED OUTDOOR THERAPY Received: On time
Monica Risam Trustee 24 September 2020
THE LEGAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION Received: On time
UNA CLEMINSON TD RGN Chair 23 May 2016 None on record
ELIZABETH BUTLER Trustee 14 June 2018 None on record
ANNY REID OBE Trustee 23 May 2016 None on record