THOMAS LANGLEYS CHARITY (INCLUDING THE POORS STOCK)

Charity number: 219354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required