THE BELGRAVE RECREATION GROUND AND ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 219594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.67k £3.26k £3.03k £3.06k £1.33k
Total expenditure £5.10k £3.34k £3.36k £2.55k £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A