Accounts and annual returns KINGSTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 219819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 October 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 October 2020 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required