MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH)

Charity number: 219830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £41.33m £48.16m £55.87m £58.28m £80.26m
Total expenditure £38.24m £42.38m £54.62m £59.95m £61.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.77m £3.25m £5.22m £4.19m £9.81m
Income - Donations and legacies £15.45m £20.66m £23.88m £26.47m £32.80m
Income - Other trading activities £15.96m £15.96m £17.14m £17.74m £12.85m
Income - Charitable activities £9.72m £11.35m £14.64m £13.83m £34.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £191.00k £188.00k £222.00k £234.00k £191.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £3.61m £3.92m £3.28m £4.47m £3.37m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.78m £25.84m £35.63m £38.32m £43.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.47m £16.54m £19.00m £21.63m £18.91m
Expenditure - Governance £115.00k £176.00k £188.00k £271.00k £248.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.84m £5.40m £6.73m £5.14m £12.68m
Expenditure - Investment management £36.34k £46.82k £49.65k £58.24k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0