Accounts and annual returns CEFNLLYS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 219892
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Annual return 24 October 2020 22 July 2022 332 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 24 October 2019 22 July 2022 697 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 October 2018 10 January 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 24 October 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2017 Not Required