Financial history CEFNLLYS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 219892
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/10/2016 24/10/2017 24/10/2018 24/10/2019 24/10/2020
Total gross income £603 £642 £132 £0 £0
Total expenditure £585 £870 £1.01k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A