PLYMOUTH HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 220010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time Download