ST DAVID'S HOME FOR DISABLED SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND AIRMEN

Charity number: 220151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.86m £4.02m £4.02m £4.23m £4.39m
Total expenditure £3.57m £3.81m £4.08m £4.18m £4.61m
Income from government contracts £1.86m £2.03m £1.07m £931.50k £930.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £73.14k £20.25k £37.16k £31.54k £149.26k
Income - Other trading activities £25.64k £42.25k £36.13k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.75m £3.95m £3.94m £4.16m £4.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.99k £6.91k £6.13k £6.88k £11.53k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £31.18k £19.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £143.94k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.57m £3.81m £4.08m £4.18m £4.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £6.60k £6.60k £8.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £150 £0 £0 £0 £0