Financial history FRIENDS OF WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 220218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £316.81k £266.81k £254.10k £537.48k £181.91k
Total expenditure £248.05k £241.60k £159.76k £635.80k £235.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £480
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £506.56k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £24.58k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6.34k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £408.34k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £621.85k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £13.95k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £960 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £564.83k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A