Trustees FRIENDS OF WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 220218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRUCE RODNEY WINGATE PARKER MBE Chair 22 December 2011
WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETH COLLEGE UK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FYFIELD OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COUNTESS OF BRECKNOCK HOSPICE TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Green-Wilkinson Trustee 14 September 2021
HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Canon George Medd Trustee 17 December 2020
None on record
Jenny Hilton Trustee 17 January 2020
None on record
Dr Cindy Wood Trustee 17 January 2020
None on record
Rev Andy Trenier Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Nigel SPICER Trustee 15 July 2017
None on record
NATALIE JANE SHAW Trustee 15 July 2017
None on record
The Very Reverend Catherine Ogle Trustee 11 February 2017
WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTHERN CATHEDRALS FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Overdue by 35 days
THE RAYMOND FREKE AWARD FUND
Received: On time
HOSPITAL OF ST CROSS AND ALMSHOUSE OF NOBLE POVERTY
Received: On time
THE CARL KLEIN TRUST
Received: On time
ST SWITHUN'S SCHOOL (WINCHESTER)
Received: On time
David William Lyon Fellowes Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record
PROFESSOR TOM WATSON Trustee 22 December 2011
None on record