MRS T H BROWN WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 220284
Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 312 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 312 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 678 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 678 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1043 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1043 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1408 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1408 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1773 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1773 days