THE LAUREL HOUSE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 220404
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 August 2020 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 August 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 July 2018 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 18 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required