THE LAUREL HOUSE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 220404
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £5.29k £4.90k £6.32k £8.00k £12.30k
Total expenditure £4.45k £4.70k £5.70k £8.60k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A