Accounts and annual returns THE MICHAEL MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 220473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 07 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window