Financial history THE MICHAEL MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 220473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £169.02k £156.08k £141.79k £142.68k £99.40k
Total expenditure £630.18k £349.92k £679.90k £274.55k £89.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A