Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN POLICE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window