CHARITY FOR THE REPARATION OF THE CHURCH AND SUSTENTATION OF THE POOR (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS ARCHER, PEARCE AND JEAME'S CHARITY)

Charity number: 220487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time Download