CHARITY FOR THE REPARATION OF THE CHURCH AND SUSTENTATION OF THE POOR (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS ARCHER, PEARCE AND JEAME'S CHARITY)

Charity number: 220487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.96k £48.96k £266.98k £58.79k £41.00k
Total expenditure £56.95k £56.95k £35.22k £55.17k £44.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A