THE LINNEAN SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 220509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.34m £2.13m £2.14m £2.10m £2.30m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.21m £1.45m £1.58m £1.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £159.20k £133.10k £102.91k £20.42k £244.98k
Income - Other trading activities £46.94k £43.32k £40.66k £57.01k £8.70k
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.85m £1.89m £1.92m £1.96m
Income - Endowments £100.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.59k £96.49k £105.30k £109.44k £86.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £5.00k £10.00k £7.63k £228.55k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.20m £1.44m £1.57m £1.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.20k £12.50k £7.82k £11.32k £11.44k
Expenditure - Governance £106.93k -£62.99k £54.57k £91.07k £61.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £64.08k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £9.20k £12.50k £7.82k £11.32k £11.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0