CHARITY FOR ST JOSEPH'S MISSIONARY SOCIETY (BRITISH REGION)

Charity number: 220690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.77m £4.14m £2.66m £2.65m £1.94m
Total expenditure £2.50m £3.09m £2.36m £2.48m £2.08m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.12m £3.50m £1.99m £1.96m £1.35m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £645.84k £646.74k £662.81k £689.84k £587.16k
Income - Other £3.14k £232 £3.79k £3.45k £4.55k
Income - Legacies £308.49k £285.92k £387.60k £351.93k £168.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.14m £2.69m £2.03m £2.12m £1.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £361.87k £394.36k £334.73k £367.14k £352.85k
Expenditure - Governance £9.90k £10.99k £10.28k £10.50k £8.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £58.74k £62.40k £74.54k £80.29k £78.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0