MISS HESTER MARIA PAYNE

Charity number: 220771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required