THE MERSEY MISSION TO SEAFARERS

Charity number: 220793
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download