THE JOHN ROPER BOUNTY FUND

Charity number: 221190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £29 £32 £34 £35 £29
Total expenditure £164 £141 £87 £85 £192
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A