THE SWANSEA CENTRE FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 221220
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download