THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 221328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Sarah Louter Trustee 01 January 2022
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Rinengi Ingleby Trustee 01 January 2020
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
John Thoburn Stansfeld Trustee 01 January 2018
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Dr KEVIN ROBERT MCKEMEY Trustee 01 January 2018
WORLDSHARE Received: On time
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Fiona Lambert Trustee 01 January 2020
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Dr Anne Keene Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
SIMON CHRISTOPHER UPCOTT FCA BFP Trustee 25 June 2020
ROYAL ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY Received: On time
SONG AND HYMN WRITERS FOUNDATION CIO Received: On time
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL CHINA CONCERN Received: On time
IAN GEOFFREY BROMILOW Trustee 01 January 2018
THE COUNCIL OF MILTON ABBEY SCHOOL LTD Received: On time
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Charles Clayton Chair 01 April 2015
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Rev Andrew Mark Bowerman Trustee 01 January 2018
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time
Beauman Sing Tat Chong Trustee 01 January 2016
WINCHESTER BASICS BANK Received: On time
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY Received: On time