Trustees THE FRESHGATE TRUST FOUNDATION
Charity number: 221467
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIZ MURRAY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Madeleine Thomas | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Scott | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
JONATHAN HOWARD ROBINSON | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Alison Danielle Joanne Gaddes Mrs | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew James Sibley | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Andrew MacDonald | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
GEOFF MARSTON | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr Emma Legdon | Trustee | 08 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
VAL LINNEMANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HOLETTA DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
USHA RANI FITCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.