THE MERSEYSIDE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 221700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.81k £2.32k £2.07k £2.46k £2.43k
Total expenditure £2.31k £1.21k £1.84k £1.91k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A