Accounts and annual returns HEYWOOD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 221704
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window