Financial history HEYWOOD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 221704
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £46.62k £65.02k £64.51k £42.32k £70.95k
Total expenditure £41.27k £50.03k £59.50k £43.89k £53.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.00k