STAINFORTH COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 221758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.22k £13.63k £13.51k £12.42k £14.43k
Total expenditure £13.75k £14.63k £15.04k £13.12k £13.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A