STAINFORTH COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 221758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Boris Segal Trustee 13 November 2018
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
MARINA ROURKE Trustee None on record
Christine Ruane Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
JULIA KEEGAN Trustee 24 November 2015
ROBERT FORSTERS CHARITY Received: On time
IRIS MOORE Trustee 01 November 2012 None on record
JOAN BOLTON Trustee
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
ANNETTE BRADBURY Trustee None on record
BLODWEN THWAITES Trustee None on record
Phillip Antony Bedford Trustee 17 May 2016
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
DAVID MOORE Trustee 01 April 2005
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
John Waggitt Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
LORRAINE CROSBY Chair
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
Stuart Bolton Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
Ken Keegan Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
KEITH ALLSOPP Trustee 23 May 2017
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
Harry Fisher Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
ARLENE ABBOTT Trustee 17 May 2016
STAINFORTH MINERS' RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
CHRISTEL WOOD Trustee 06 November 2012 None on record
Anne Sylvester Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
JOHN PETER THOMPSON Trustee None on record
CATH O'NEILL Trustee None on record
Leslie Derx Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record