Financial history M B FOUNDATION (ALSO KNOWN AS MOSSAD HORAV MOSHE ARYEH HALEVY)

Charity number: 222104
Charity reporting is up to date (232 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.26m £1.53m £307.83k £941.24k £436.68k
Total expenditure £1.17m £911.85k £1.18m £884.22k £761.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £746.44k £1.14m N/A £334.85k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £512.99k £383.33k N/A £606.39k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £831.32k N/A £867.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £91.18k £80.54k N/A £17.23k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.18k N/A £6.26k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.06m £819.60k N/A £831.28k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £91.18k £80.54k N/A £17.23k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A