Financial history HENRY JAMES SAYER CHARITY

Charity number: 222438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £30.43k £77.77k £79.88k £83.10k £96.69k
Total expenditure £32.25k £58.38k £83.41k £74.17k £84.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A