CHILD ACTION NORTHWEST

Charity number: 222533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.38m £4.25m £4.80m £5.49m £5.25m
Total expenditure £4.58m £4.20m £4.76m £5.68m £5.64m
Income from government contracts £4.13m £4.10m £1.76m £2.52m £4.99m
Income from government grants £0 £26.80k N/A £117.78k £100.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £76.64k £54.37k £73.03k £54.25k £56.44k
Income - Other trading activities £111.61k £16.68k £2.20k £9.44k £797
Income - Charitable activities £4.13m £4.13m £4.69m £5.39m £5.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.98k £46.91k £35.65k £36.88k £37.19k
Income - Other £16.17k £4.85k £6.58k £4.05k £4.16k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £15 £2.02k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.36m £4.03m £4.56m £5.48m £5.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £189.04k £168.98k £201.94k £200.77k £200.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.32k £16.64k £18.36k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £14.42k £15.93k £19.26k £0
Expenditure - Other £32.60k £0 £0 £0 £0