Trustees CHILD ACTION NORTHWEST
Charity number: 222533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marguerite Webb | Chair | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Miranda Rathmell | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lewis Alexander Baxter | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nathanial Paul Eatwell | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Mark Damp | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Comyn-Platt | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
GORDON HAYES FAIRWEATHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.