Trustees THE LEAGUE OF NEVILL HALL FRIENDS
Charity number: 222591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hoddy | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Pendry | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Sheridan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clarke | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Spencer | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Heather Sheila Woodhouse | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|||||
MARY ANNE WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ann Powell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA NANNETTE MCINTEE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.