SWINTON PENDLEBURY AND CLIFTON CARE OF THE ELDERLY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 222641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £70.36k £67.24k £56.01k £51.17k £43.74k
Total expenditure £57.66k £60.28k £68.47k £47.74k £49.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.95k £0 £13.32k £17.78k N/A