THE ROCHDALE FUND FOR RELIEF IN SICKNESS

Charity number: 222652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 February 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 February 2020 14 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download