THE FISHERMEN'S INSTITUTE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 222731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.20k £5.20k £5.20k £5.20k £5.20k
Total expenditure £4.08k £1.26k £1.91k £3.20k £3.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A