Financial history ST JUDE'S TRUST

Charity number: 222883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £39.77k £46.52k £46.32k £45.47k £40.51k
Total expenditure £44.62k £50.05k £48.29k £47.63k £63.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A