THE LODGE OF LOYAL SERVICE (NO 5890) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 222899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.80k £2.19k £1.95k £1.53k £746
Total expenditure £1.34k £2.34k £2.90k £2.60k £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A