THE SHEPHERD STREET TRUST

Charity number: 222922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £57.88k £55.32k £57.81k £58.79k £54.52k
Total expenditure £44.86k £51.59k £60.89k £54.95k £61.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A