THE SHEPHERD STREET TRUST

Charity number: 222922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WENDY EVANS Trustee 21 March 2011 None on record
RACHEL RYCROFT Trustee 06 February 2013 None on record
STUART SHORTHOUSE Trustee None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES SCOTT Trustee None on record
CATHERINE PENNY Chair
ST JOHN'S OLD SCHOOL CHARITY Received: 41 days late
PLANT HERITAGE Received: On time
Jeremy George Frederick Harries Trustee 10 January 2017 None on record
MRS KATE WHITAKER Trustee 15 July 2014 None on record
DIANA SUSAN ROBERTSON Trustee 13 May 2014 None on record
Dr MARTIN WHEATMAN Trustee 06 February 2013 None on record