SOUTHPORT AND DISTRICT CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 222928
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £19.08k £2.14k £1.65k £3.19k £2.94k
Total expenditure £18.18k £6.41k £5.49k £6.47k £5.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A