Financial history THE BROADHEATH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 223041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.52k £17.74k £18.36k £23.56k £4.45k
Total expenditure £12.40k £11.71k £13.65k £25.35k £16.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A