SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND OF DEWSBURY BATLEY AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 223298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £138.26k £105.29k £108.49k £75.54k £48.86k
Total expenditure £176.23k £152.89k £136.94k £130.85k £131.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.15k £29.54k £0 N/A N/A