CHARITY OF MRS MARY ANN BLAKEMORE MINOR FOR GENTLEWOMEN IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES

Charity number: 223321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required