READING ROOM FUND

Charity number: 223973
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 December 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required