YORKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 224083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download